Attorneys

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0014Circuit Courts - Fee for Special Admission of Out-of-State Attorney - Janet L. Hoffman Loan Assistance Repayment ProgramDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0236 / CH0507
    (SB0794 / CH0508)
Legal Advice to Corporations - ClarificationDelegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 507Judiciary
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0404 / CH0425
    (SB0234)
St. Mary's County - Land Records - RepealSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 425Environment and Transportation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0416
    (SB0442)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodyDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryFamily Law (D4)
HB0554 / CH0830
    (SB0374 / CH0831)
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners - AttorneysDelegate CareyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 830Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0595 / CH0520
    (SB0376 / CH0521)
Mortgages and Deeds of Trust - Prerequisites to RecordingDelegate McMillanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 520Environment and Transportation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0641Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Limitation of DamagesDelegate Wilson, C.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0880 / CH0525
    (SB0450 / CH0526)
Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and TrainingDelegate MoralesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 525Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0913 / CH0026
    (SB0665)
Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017Delegate RosenbergEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0966Legislative and Congressional DistrictingDelegate HillIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0976
    (SB0550)
Frederick County - Ethics Requirements and Campaign Activity Concerning the County Executive and County CouncilFrederick County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Ethics (G2)
HB1077Attorney's Liens - Settlement Providing for Conveyance of Real Property - EnforcementDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1142Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Disciplinary Proceedings - Students and Student OrganizationsDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1165Estates - Duties of Guardian of the Person - Fostering and Preserving Family RelationshipsDelegate SaabIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB1173Real Property - Rent-to-Own Agreements and Contracts - RequirementsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Real Property (N1)
HB1297Domestic Violence - Petitioner - Attorney for ChildDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1558Postconviction Relief - Ineffective Assistance by Counsel - Mandatory Referral to Attorney Grievance CommissionDelegate AndersonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0026 / CH0632Maryland False Claims Act - Municipal CorporationsSenator KaganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 632Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0144Civil Actions - Prelitigation Discovery of Insurance CoverageSenator ZirkinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0234
    (HB0404 / CH0425)
St. Mary's County - Land Records - RepealSenator WaughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0374 / CH0831
    (HB0554 / CH0830)
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners - AttorneysSenator AstleEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 831Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0376 / CH0521
    (HB0595 / CH0520)
Mortgages and Deeds of Trust - Prerequisites to RecordingSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 521Judicial Proceedings
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0442
    (HB0416)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodySenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0500 / CH0544Small Claim Action Appeals From District Court - Nonattorney RepresentationSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 544Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0550
    (HB0976)
Frederick County - Ethics Requirements and Campaign Activity Concerning the County Executive and County CouncilSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB0794 / CH0508
    (HB0236 / CH0507)
Legal Advice to Corporations - ClarificationSenator SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 508Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.