Attorneys

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0097 / CH0591State Board of Law Examiners – Sunset ExtensionSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 591Judiciary
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0194 / CH0049State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Requirement to Register - ExemptionsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 49Economic Matters
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0349
    (SB0296)
Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders - Felonies (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2018)SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0355
    (SB0302)
Accountability in Education Act of 2018SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0419 / CH0130Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of the Inspector General PG/MC 101-18Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 130Environment and Transportation
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0524
    (SB0291)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodyDelegate MoonIn the House - Passed EnrolledJudiciary
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0556 / CH0233
    (SB0466)
Estates and Trusts - Administration of Estates - Waiver of FeesDelegate SydnorApproved by the Governor - Chapter 233Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB0603
    (SB1033)
Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Disciplinary Proceedings - Students and Student OrganizationsDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0913 / CH0395
    (SB0607 / CH0394)
Higher Education – Sexual Assault Policy – Disciplinary Proceedings ProvisionsDelegate Miller, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395Appropriations
3/1/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0942Real Property – Body Attachments – Debt Related to Residential TenancyDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Real Property (N1)
HB0949Attorney Grievance Commission - MembershipDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1253
    (SB0068)
Business Regulation - Collection Agencies - Exemptions From LicensureDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/9/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1304Family Law – Minors – Emancipation (Emancipation of Minors Act)Delegate AtterbearyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1425Family Law - Guardianship and Adoption - Age of Consent and Revocation of ConsentDelegate CilibertiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1439
    (SB0870)
Criminal Procedure - Office of the Attorney General - Subpoena PowerSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1483 / CH0287Duties of a Guardian of the Person - VisitationDelegate SaabApproved by the Governor - Chapter 287Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB1559Court Records - Unserved Arrest Warrant and Charging Document - Inspection by AttorneyDelegate VallarioIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1586 / CH0088
    (SB0355 / CH0087)
Wicomico County - Motorcycles - Sunday SalesDelegate AndertonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 88Economic Matters
3/12/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1728Postconviction Relief - Ineffective Assistance by Counsel - Mandatory Referral to Attorney Grievance CommissionDelegate AndersonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0068
    (HB1253)
Business Regulation - Collection Agencies - Exemptions From LicensureSenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0291
    (HB0524)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodySenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Returned PassedJudicial Proceedings
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0296
    (HB0349)
Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders - Felonies (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2018)PresidentIn the Senate - Senate Requests House RecedeJudicial Proceedings
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB0302
    (HB0355)
Accountability in Education Act of 2018PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2018 - 12:45 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0355 / CH0087
    (HB1586 / CH0088)
Wicomico County - Motorcycles - Sunday SalesSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 87Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0607 / CH0394
    (HB0913 / CH0395)
Higher Education – Sexual Assault Policy – Disciplinary Proceedings ProvisionsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 394Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0621 / CH0636Real Property - Deletion of Ownership Restrictions Based on Race, Religious Belief, or National OriginSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 636Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0769 / CH0365Criminal Law - Sextortion and Revenge PornSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 365Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0870
    (HB1439)
Criminal Procedure – Office of the Attorney General – Subpoena PowerPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0974State Government - Office of the Attorney General - Appropriation and Staffing (Judicial Use, Spending, Trial, Investigation, and Constitutional Errata (JUSTICE) Act of 2018)Senator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB1033
    (HB0603)
Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Disciplinary Proceedings - Students and Student OrganizationsSenator HoughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB1099 / CH0753
    (HB0561)
Baltimore City Police Department – Commission to Restore Trust in Policing and Audit ReviewSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 753Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/6/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB1246Criminal Procedure - Partial ExpungementSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:39 A.M.