Attorneys' Fees

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0049Breach of Contract - Attorney's FeesDelegate NormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/22/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0053 / CH0584Public Records - Provision of Copies, Printouts, and Photographs - RequiredDelegate VitaleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 584Health and Government Operations
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0078Public Service Commission - Participant CompensationDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0187Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of WagesDelegate BraveboyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0219 / CH0089
    (SB0216)
Workers' Compensation - Workers' Compensation Commission - Issuance of SubpoenasDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 89Economic Matters
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB0283
    (SB0034)
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0295 / CH0262
    (SB0331)
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 262Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0430Commercial Law - Patent Infringement - Assertions Made in Bad FaithDelegate CardinVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB0446 / CH0599Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Attorney's FeesDelegate StukesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 599Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0527Labor and Employment - Earned Sick LeaveDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0568
    (SB0544)
Civil Actions - Award of Attorney's Fees and ExpensesDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0867Maryland False Claims ActDelegate AroraIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsJudiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0912 / CH0242
    (SB0924)
Courts - Electronic Communications - PrivacyDelegate SmigielApproved by the Governor - Chapter 242Judiciary
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0940Tax Sales - Reimbursement for ExpensesDelegate StukesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0971Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Unpaid Assessments and Fees - Petition for ReliefDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1026 / CH0334
    (SB0737 / CH0333)
Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a ChildDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 334Economic Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1191
    (SB0778)
Health - General - Genetically Engineered Food - Labeling RequirementsDelegate KellyIn the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1314Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law - Awards of Certain Fees and Costs and Prohibition Against RetaliationDelegate HuckerIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedEconomic Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1328
    (SB0865 / CH0567)
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member RightsDelegate SwainIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsEnvironmental Matters
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Real Property (N1)
HB1337
    (SB0798)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1529
    (SB1095)
Real Property - Ground RentsDelegate McIntoshIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0034
    (HB0283)
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0040 / CH0008
    (HB0181)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of CounselCarroll County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 8Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0216
    (HB0219 / CH0089)
Workers' Compensation - Workers' Compensation Commission - Issuance of SubpoenasSenator KlausmeierVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Workers' Compensation (K1)
SB0326Elected Officials - Civil Cases - Liability for Costs, Judgments, and Settlements (Taxpayer Protection Act of 2014)Senator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0331
    (HB0295 / CH0262)
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/17/2014 - 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0544
    (HB0568)
Civil Actions - Award of Attorney's Fees and ExpensesSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0585 / CH0307Commercial Law - Patent Infringement - Assertions Made in Bad FaithSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 307Finance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0737 / CH0333
    (HB1026 / CH0334)
Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a ChildSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 333Finance
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0778
    (HB1191)
Health - General - Genetically Engineered Food - Labeling RequirementsSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0798
    (HB1337)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0865 / CH0567
    (HB1328)
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member RightsSenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 567Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0924
    (HB0912 / CH0242)
Courts - Electronic Communications - PrivacySenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1095
    (HB1529)
Real Property - Ground RentsSenator FroshIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.