Attorneys' Fees

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0241
    (SB0167)
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for ExpensesDelegate WalkerIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0340
    (SB0405)
Criminal Law - Extortion - Unauthorized SoftwareDelegate BarronIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0531Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to WorkDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0540
    (SB0947)
Hate Crimes - Civil RemedyDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0547Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActDelegate CilibertiIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0699
    (SB0301)
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging EquipmentDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0722
    (SB0881)
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving SpouseDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0744 / CH0674
    (SB0481)
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous ProvisionsDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 674Economic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB0772
    (SB0287)
Civil Action - Unauthorized Access to Computers and DataDelegate LisantiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0849
    (SB0615)
Courts - Physical Invasion of Privacy - Civil Cause of ActionDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0903
    (SB0705)
Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses - Violation of Maryland Constitutional RightDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1143Maryland Pay Stub Transparency Act of 2017Delegate LiermanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceEconomic Matters
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1167
    (SB0841)
Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2017Delegate WivellIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1247Family Law - Child Support Actions - Court CostsDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1511
    (SB0626)
Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by EmployeesDelegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0167
    (HB0241)
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for ExpensesSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Recommitted to Budget and Taxation (Senator Conway)Budget and Taxation
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0287
    (HB0772)
Civil Action - Unauthorized Access to Computers and DataSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0301
    (HB0699)
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging EquipmentSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0405
    (HB0340)
Criminal Law - Extortion - Unauthorized SoftwareSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0481
    (HB0744 / CH0674)
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous ProvisionsSenator FeldmanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB0490Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to Work ActSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0615
    (HB0849)
Courts - Physical Invasion of Privacy - Civil Cause of ActionSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0626
    (HB1511)
Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by EmployeesSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0699
    (HB0467 / CH0782)
Providing Our Workers Education and Readiness (POWER) - Apprenticeship ActSenator RosapepeIn the House - Second Reading PassedFinance
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Economic MattersCapital Budget (B5)
SB0705
    (HB0903)
Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses - Violation of Maryland Constitutional RightSenator MuseIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0726Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law - Awards of Certain Fees and Costs and Prohibition Against RetaliationSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0841
    (HB1167)
Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2017Senator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0881
    (HB0722)
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving SpouseSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
SB0947
    (HB0540)
Hate Crimes - Civil RemedySenator SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:32 A.M.