Attorneys' Fees

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0264Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to WorkDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0456
    (SB0376)
Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers - Cyber Intrusion and RansomwareDelegate BarronIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0602Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging EquipmentDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0777
    (SB0649)
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving SpouseDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0913 / CH0395
    (SB0607 / CH0394)
Higher Education – Sexual Assault Policy – Disciplinary Proceedings ProvisionsDelegate Miller, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395Appropriations
3/1/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0956Civil Action - Offense Against Vulnerable or Elderly AdultDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1119Hate Crimes - Civil RemedyDelegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1270
    (SB1042)
Access to Maryland Courts ActDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1293Family Law - Child Support Guidelines - Actual Income and Attorney's FeesDelegate MetzgarIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1355
    (SB1067)
Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2018Delegate WivellIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/9/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1424Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActDelegate CilibertiIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/9/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1500 / CH0534
    (SB0979 / CH0535)
Workers’ Compensation – Third–Party Actions – Subsequent Injury FundDelegate ValderramaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 534Economic Matters
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1513Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses ActDelegate FennellIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
HB1596 / CH0738
    (SB1010 / CH0739)
Disclosing Sexual Harassment in the Workplace Act of 2018Delegate ValderramaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 738Economic Matters
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1723 / CH0625Charles County - Work Release - Collection of Inmate EarningsCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 625Judiciary
3/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1757
    (SB1124)
Garrett County – Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention ProgramsDelegate BeitzelIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0376
    (HB0456)
Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers - Cyber Intrusion and RansomwareSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0525Public Institutions of Higher Education – Discriminatory HarassmentSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0572Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by EmployeesSenator BensonVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Finance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0607 / CH0394
    (HB0913 / CH0395)
Higher Education – Sexual Assault Policy – Disciplinary Proceedings ProvisionsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 394Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0649
    (HB0777)
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving SpouseSenator KelleyIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0979 / CH0535
    (HB1500 / CH0534)
Workers' Compensation - Third-Party Actions - Subsequent Injury FundSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 535Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersWorkers' Compensation (K1)
SB1010 / CH0739
    (HB1596 / CH0738)
Disclosing Sexual Harassment in the Workplace Act of 2018Senator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 739Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB1042
    (HB1270)
Access to Maryland Courts ActSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1067
    (HB1355)
Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2018Senator ReadyIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesPublic Health (J1)
SB1068 / CH0732
    (HB1634 / CH0731)
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018Senator RosapepeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 732Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB1079
    (HB1349 / CH0451)
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - RevisionsSenator MathiasVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB1124
    (HB1757)
Garrett County – Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Home Detention ProgramsSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:55 P.M.