Awards, Medals and Prizes

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0003 / CH0501Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Olympic, Paralympic, Special Olympic, and Deaflympic Games Medals and PrizesDelegate LisantiApproved by the Governor - Chapter 501Ways and Means
1/18/2017 - 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0021
    (SB0053)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Olympic and Paralympic Games Medals and PrizesDelegate CareyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0085 / CH0474Anne Arundel County - Charitable GamingAnne Arundel County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 474Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0090
    (SB0496 / CH0445)
Gaming - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Licensee PaymentsChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0152 / CH0023
    (SB0172)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0300 / CH0451Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed WinningsDelegate FennellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 451Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0350Montgomery County - Gaming - Bingo Games MC 16-17Montgomery County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0464 / CH0466Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Exhibition PermitDelegate BranchApproved by the Governor - Chapter 466Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0895
    (SB0655)
Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support PaymentsDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Horse Racing (C6)
HB0990Harford County - BingoHarford County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1537 / CH0449
    (SB1125 / CH0450)
Video Lottery Facilities - Donation of Coins From Gaming Payouts - ExpansionDelegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 449Ways and Means
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0013Public Safety - State MilitiaChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0053
    (HB0021)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Olympic and Paralympic Games Medals and PrizesSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
1/18/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0172
    (HB0152 / CH0023)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0228 / CH0452Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed WinningsSenator SallingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 452Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0655
    (HB0895)
Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support PaymentsSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Horse Racing (C6)
SB1006Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - AuthorizationSenator JenningsIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-1)Budget and Taxation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 8, 2017 2:45 P.M.