Awards, Medals and Prizes

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0010State Lottery - Unclaimed Prizes - Public Prekindergarten ProgramsDelegate WalkerIn the House - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0143Carroll County and Montgomery County – Gaming – Bingo Games MC 13–18Montgomery County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0159 / CH0122Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer Permit MC 21-18Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 122Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0781 / CH0388
    (SB0842 / CH0389)
Higher Education - Educational Excellence Award Eligibility - High School Diploma by ExaminationDelegate MosbyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 388Ways and Means
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0868
    (SB0992)
Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - AuthorizationDelegate ReillyIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0094 / CH0670Natural Resources – Unprotected Birds and MammalsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 670Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0790General Provisions – Historical State SongSenator KaganIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0842 / CH0389
    (HB0781 / CH0388)
Higher Education - Educational Excellence Award Eligibility - High School Diploma by ExaminationSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 389Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0992
    (HB0868)
Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - AuthorizationSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 4:07 P.M.