Bail

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0153Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - ProvisionalDelegate AndersonIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0476
    (SB0720)
Criminal Procedure - Alien Defendants - Nullity of Bail BondsDelegate SimmonsIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0777
    (SB0505 / CH0487)
Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Cash BailDelegate Kelly, K.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0786 / CH0639Juvenile Law - Task Force on Juvenile Court JurisdictionDelegate CarterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 639Judiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB1109Criminal Procedure - Defendants Held on No Bail Status - Comprehensive Risk AssessmentDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1259Crimes - Elder Abuse or Neglect - Restrictions on Pretrial ReleaseDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0505 / CH0487
    (HB0777)
Criminal Procedure - Bail Bonds - Cash BailSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 487Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0648Juvenile Law - Jurisdiction and DetentionSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0720
    (HB0476)
Criminal Procedure - Alien Defendants - Nullity of Bail BondsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1069Criminal Procedure - Issuance of Summonses and Arrest Warrants and Restrictions on Pretrial ReleaseSenator ShankIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.