Ballots

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0113
    (SB0173)
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Selection of Members - Straw BallotDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0137Election Law - Polling Places - Proof of IdentityDelegate KipkeIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0196 / CH0198
    (SB0171 / CH0197)
Election Law - Special Elections - Voting by Mail Delegate CardinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 198Ways and Means
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0224 / CH0158
    (SB0279 / CH0157)
Election Law - Improving Access to VotingSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 158Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0236Election Law - Districting Plan Questions - Inclusion of MapDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/11/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0242
    (SB0519)
Election Law - Registration and Voting at Early Voting CentersDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0325Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of IdentityDelegate AfzaliIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0413
    (SB0010)
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0427Election Law - Absentee Ballots - TimelinessDelegate ImpallariaIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0493
    (SB0673)
Referendum Integrity ActDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0515
    (SB0327)
Elections for Judges - Nonpartisan ElectionsDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsWays and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0758Election Law - Polling Places - Waiting Times to VoteDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansElections (G1)
HB0867General Assembly - Use of Public Resources - Ballot IssuesDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0907Electronic Voting System Devices - Ballot ArrangementDelegate KachIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0974Election Law - Subsequent Election Absentee Ballot ListDelegate KramerIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1234Election of Circuit Court Judges - Random Ordering of NamesDelegate FrankIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Elections (G1)
HB1499 / CH0419
    (SB1039)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 419Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
SB0010
    (HB0413)
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0108Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Selection of Members - Straw BallotSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 1:30 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0171 / CH0197
    (HB0196 / CH0198)
Election Law - Special Elections - Voting by MailSenator ForehandApproved by the Governor - Chapter 197Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0173
    (HB0113)
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Selection of Members - Straw BallotAnne Arundel County SenatorsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0279 / CH0157
    (HB0224 / CH0158)
Election Law - Improving Access to VotingPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 157Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0294Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan General ElectionsSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0327
    (HB0515)
Elections for Judges of the Orphans' Courts - Nonpartisan ElectionsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Dyson)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0519
    (HB0242)
Election Law - Registration and Voting at Early Voting CentersSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0673
    (HB0493)
Referendum Integrity ActSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0840 / CH0567Voting - Notice of Election by Specimen BallotSenator StoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 567Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0901Election Law - Elections by MailSenator DysonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB1039
    (HB1499 / CH0419)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013PresidentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.