Ballots

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0025Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee VotingDelegate GeorgeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Municipal Corporations (L3)
HB0384
    (SB0290 / CH0480)
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1094Election Law - Polling Places - Proof of IdentityDelegate SchuhIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1327
    (SB0582)
Election Law - Redistricting Ballot Questions - Map of Proposed DistrictsDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1453 / CH0481
    (SB1062)
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersBaltimore County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 481Ways and Means
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0290 / CH0480
    (HB0384)
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersSenator BrochinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 480Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0438 / CH0501Municipal Elections - Inclusion of Offices and Questions on the State BallotSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 501Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Municipal Corporations (L3)
SB0582
    (HB1327)
Election Law - Redistricting Ballot Questions - Map of Proposed DistrictsSenator StoneIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0636Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Method for Selection of Members (Listen to the People Act of 2014)Senator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0848Election Law - Local Petitions - Advance Determination of Sufficiency of Local Legislation SummarySenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB1062
    (HB1453 / CH0481)
Education - Baltimore County School Board Nominating CommissionSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs Education - Local Bills (F3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.