Ballots

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0063Elections - Ballots - Random Ordering of NamesDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0280
    (SB1061)
Ballot Access - Voter Registration - Affiliating With a PartyDelegate TarlauIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0542Election Law - Eligible Detainees - Information on Voting RightsDelegate AliIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0662
    (SB0256)
Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency ActDelegate TarlauIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0767Election Law - Securing Elections From Foreign InterferenceDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0768Election Law - Online Political Advertisements and Campaign Material - DisclosureDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0829 / CH0746
    (SB0730 / CH0745)
Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee VotingDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 746Ways and Means
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsMunicipalities (L3)
HB1278 / CH0523Election Law - Postelection Tabulation AuditDelegate KaiserApproved by the Governor - Chapter 523Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1326Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of CitizenshipDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1331 / CH0524Election Law - CybersecurityDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 524Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1427Election Law – Use of Ballot Marking DevicesDelegate ConawayIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1563Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of IdentityDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1658
    (SB1126)
Election Law – Absentee Ballot Requests, Delivery, and MarkingDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0256
    (HB0662)
Presidential Candidate Tax Transparency ActSenator PinskyIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0333Election Law - Voting - Ballot Request and Canvassing ProceduresSenator SimonaireIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0547Election Law - Elections by MailSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0591Elections - Absentee Ballot Application - Required InformationSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0592Joint Committee on Election Oversight - EstablishmentSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0730 / CH0745
    (HB0829 / CH0746)
Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee VotingSenator SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 745Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Municipalities (L3)
SB1061
    (HB0280)
Ballot Access - Voter Registration - Affiliating With a PartySenator KaganIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB1126
    (HB1658)
Election Law - Absentee Ballot Requests, Delivery, and MarkingSenator KasemeyerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 15, 2018 1:18 P.M.