Banks and Trust Companies

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0010Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersDelegate BeidleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0365 / CH0225
    (SB0254)
Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - DistributionDelegate ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 225Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0550
    (SB0812)
Child Support - Income Tax Refund Intercept - Priority of Requests and Information to ObligeeDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0714 / CH0237
    (SB0810)
Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - ProhibitionsDelegate LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 237Judiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0723 / CH0421Money Transmission - Protection From Financial Abuse, Financial Exploitation, and Fraud - RequirementsDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 421Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB0728
    (SB0222)
Commission to Investigate the Treatment of Lender-Owned PropertiesDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Real Property (N1)
HB0735
    (SB0583 / CH0306)
Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings AccountsDelegate OlszewskiVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB1165 / CH0349
    (SB0875 / CH0348)
Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan ProgramDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 349Economic Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1298
    (SB0395)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2014Delegate HealeyIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1322
    (SB0755)
Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and StudyDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HJ0008
    (SJ0008)
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking FunctionsDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
SB0222
    (HB0728)
Commission to Investigate the Treatment of Lender-Owned PropertiesSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0254
    (HB0365 / CH0225)
Public Safety - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - DistributionSenator GlassmanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations Public Safety (E4)
SB0395
    (HB1298)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2014Senator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0583 / CH0306
    (HB0735)
Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings AccountsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 306Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Financial Institutions (I1)
SB0755
    (HB1322)
Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and StudySenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0810
    (HB0714 / CH0237)
Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - ProhibitionsSenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0812
    (HB0550)
Child Support - Income Tax Refund Intercept - Priority of Requests and Information to ObligeeSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0875 / CH0348
    (HB1165 / CH0349)
Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan ProgramSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 348Finance
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0985 / CH0365Maryland Clean Energy Center - Green Banks and Clean Bank Financing - StudySenator FroshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 365Finance
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SJ0008
    (HJ0008)
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking FunctionsSenator MuseIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Financial Institutions (I1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.