Banks and Trust Companies

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0143 / CH0107Elections - Miscellaneous Duties and ProceduresChair, Ways and Means CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 107Ways and Means
2/7/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0202 / CH0268
    (SB0255 / CH0267)
State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement ExemptionDelegate Barnes, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2017 - 8:30 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0591Task Force to Study the Local Economic Impact of Bank Deserts in MarylandDelegate ConawayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB0718 / CH0266
    (SB0206 / CH0265)
Financial Institutions - Qualifications of Directors of Commercial Banks - ResidencyDelegate CareyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 266Economic Matters
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB0782
    (SB0402)
Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency ProceedingsDelegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1168 / CH0618
    (SB0957 / CH0619)
Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank AuthoritiesDelegate HolmesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 618Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Counties - Generally (L1)
HB1184Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - ReductionsDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB1400
    (SB1098)
Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service AgreementsDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
HB1499Consumer Protection - Bank Overdraft Plans - RequirementsDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HJ0004Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking FunctionsDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
SB0206 / CH0265
    (HB0718 / CH0266)
Financial Institutions - Qualifications of Directors of Commercial Banks - ResidencySenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 265Finance
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersFinancial Institutions (I1)
SB0255 / CH0267
    (HB0202 / CH0268)
State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement ExemptionSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 267Budget and Taxation
2/2/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0402
    (HB0782)
Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency ProceedingsSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0512Civil Actions and Procedures - Garnishments - Spousal PropertySenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0957 / CH0619
    (HB1168 / CH0618)
Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank AuthoritiesSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 619Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and TransportationCounties - Generally (L1)
SB1098
    (HB1400)
Commercial Law - Credit Card Processors - Service AgreementsSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceCommercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:28 A.M.