Beverage Containers

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 31

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0018 / CH0604
    (SB0016)
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container LicenseAnne Arundel County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 604Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0074
    (SB0260)
Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption of Wine Not Bought from License HolderSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0133 / CH0447
    (SB0150 / CH0446)
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable ContainersDorchester County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 447Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0145 / CH0215
    (SB0244 / CH0214)
City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container LicenseAnne Arundel County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 215Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0162 / CH0192
    (SB0148 / CH0191)
Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery LicensesCaroline County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 192Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0194
    (SB0270)
Baltimore City - School Facilities - FundingDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0216 / CH0358
    (SB0035)
Queen Anne's County and St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery LicensesSenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 358Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0275 / CH0461
    (SB0349 / CH0460)
Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013Wicomico County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 461Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0455 / CH0117Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Containers Ho. Co. 15-13Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 117Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0459Somerset County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer and Wine Tasting LicenseDelegate OttoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0649 / CH0130Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Beer Containers MC 4-13Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 130Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0672 / CH0133Montgomery County - Consumption of Wine Not Bought from License Holder - Class H Licenses MC 17-13Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 133Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0749 / CH0387
    (SB0767)
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Permits, and Other AuthorizationsDelegate BeitzelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 387Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0860 / CH0647
    (SB0743)
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013Baltimore City DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 647Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB1085
    (SB0641)
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive ProgramDelegate McIntoshIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB1087Recycling - Bars and Restaurants - Beverage ContainersDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB1088 / CH0146Business Regulation - Returnable Containers and Returnable Textiles - RevisionsDelegate NiemannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 146Economic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1387 / CH0591
    (SB0957 / CH0590)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Banquet Facility LicenseFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 591Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0016
    (HB0018 / CH0604)
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container LicenseSenator ReillyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0035
    (HB0216 / CH0358)
Queen Anne's County and St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery LicensesSenator PipkinIn the House - Favorable Report by Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0148 / CH0191
    (HB0162 / CH0192)
Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Brewery LicensesSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 191Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0150 / CH0446
    (HB0133 / CH0447)
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable ContainersSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 446Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0244 / CH0214
    (HB0145 / CH0215)
City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container LicenseSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 214Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0260
    (HB0074)
Alcoholic Beverages - Consumption of Wine Not Bought from License HolderSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0270
    (HB0194)
Baltimore City - School Facilities - FundingSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledBudget and TaxationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0349 / CH0460
    (HB0275 / CH0461)
Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013Senator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 460Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0392 / CH0253Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable ContainersCecil County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 253Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0641
    (HB1085)
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive ProgramSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environment (M3)
SB0767
    (HB0749 / CH0387)
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Permits, and Other AuthorizationsSenator EdwardsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0955 / CH0589Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Class 5 Manufacturer's LicenseSenator BrinkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 589Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0957 / CH0590
    (HB1387 / CH0591)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Banquet Facility LicenseSenator BrinkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 590Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:42 A.M.