Beverage Containers

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0088 / CH0061Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Containers MC 19-15Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 61Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0089 / CH0062Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BD-BWL License MC 18-15Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 62Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0273
    (SB0500 / CH0178)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Events, Licensing, Alcohol Awareness Requirements, and FinesFrederick County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0475Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Container PermitsHarford County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0756 / CH0273Alcoholic Beverages - Charles County and Queen Anne's CountyDelegate ArentzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 273Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0794
    (SB0634 / CH0186)
Washington County - Liquor Tasting LicenseWashington County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0835 / CH0105
    (SB0633)
Alcoholic Beverages - Washington County - Refillable Container PermitWashington County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 105Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0982
    (SB0684)
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction ProgramDelegate FrushIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB1023
    (SB0296)
Public Schools - Thirsty Kids ActDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0296
    (HB1023)
Public Schools - Thirsty Kids ActSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0299 / CH0158Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Wine Container PermitsHarford County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 158Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0354Alcoholic Beverages - Charles County and Queen Anne's CountySenator HersheyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0500 / CH0178
    (HB0273)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Events, Licensing, Alcohol Awareness Requirements, and FinesSenator YoungApproved by the Governor - Chapter 178Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0633
    (HB0835 / CH0105)
Alcoholic Beverages - Washington County - Refillable Container PermitWashington County SenatorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0634 / CH0186
    (HB0794)
Washington County - Liquor Tasting LicenseWashington County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 186Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0684
    (HB0982)
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction ProgramSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Referred to interim study by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.