Beverage Containers

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0299
    (SB0130 / CH0050)
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit for Draft BeerDelegate OttoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0549 / CH0108
    (SB0634)
Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container PermitCaroline County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 108Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0616Alcoholic Beverages - Class 1 Distillery LicensesDelegate BarkleyIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedEconomic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0697 / CH0112Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Beer, Wine, and Liquor LicenseDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 112Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0739 / CH0628Alcoholic Beverages - Nonprofit Beer Festival Permit - RevisionsDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 628Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0791 / CH0120
    (SB0746)
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting LicenseCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 120Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0841 / CH0126
    (SB0693)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel Lobby LicenseFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 126Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0862
    (SB0367)
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction ActDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB0892 / CH0429
    (SB0795 / CH0428)
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Movie Theater LicenseHarford County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 429Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0931Alcoholic Beverages - Warehouse Shopping Clubs - Beer or Wine LicensesDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1021 / CH0730Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Notice Requirements, and Loitering Enforcement PG 303-16Prince George's County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1031 / CH0291
    (SB0860)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container PermitsFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 291Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1069 / CH0293Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Entertainment Concessionaire and Facility Licenses PG 311-16Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 293Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1237Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses - Purchases From Licensed Wholesalers MC 3-16Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1238Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Beer Kegs by Class 5 BreweriesDelegate GrammerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1320 / CH0587
    (SB0877 / CH0586)
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class CT (Cinema/Theater) LicenseDelegate Wilson, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 587Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0130 / CH0050
    (HB0299)
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit for Draft BeerSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 50Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0328
    (HB0220)
Criminal Procedure - ExpungementSenator ConwayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0367
    (HB0862)
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container Recycling Refund and Litter Reduction ActSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment (M3)
SB0634
    (HB0549 / CH0108)
Caroline County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container PermitCaroline County SenatorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0649 / CH0419City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit for Draft BeerSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 419Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0693
    (HB0841 / CH0126)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Hotel Lobby LicenseSenator YoungVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0724 / CH0041Alcoholic Beverages ArticlePresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 41Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0746
    (HB0791 / CH0120)
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting LicenseSenator ReadyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0795 / CH0428
    (HB0892 / CH0429)
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Movie Theater LicenseSenator JenningsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 428Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0860
    (HB1031 / CH0291)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container PermitsSenator YoungVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0877 / CH0586
    (HB1320 / CH0587)
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class CT (Cinema/Theater) LicenseWashington County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 586Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0967 / CH0113Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Beer, Wine, and Liquor LicenseSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 113Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.