Beverage Containers

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0179 / CH0493
    (SB0209)
Frederick County - Beer and Wine Licenses - BarbershopsFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 493Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0289 / CH0778
    (SB0479 / CH0602)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Marketplace LicenseDelegate HayesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 778Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0292 / CH0317
    (SB0491 / CH0318)
Alcoholic Beverages - Nonrefillable Containers - Draft BeerDelegate KrebsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 317Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0296Alcoholic Beverages - Warehouse Shopping Clubs - Beer or Wine LicensesDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0380
    (SB0937)
Alcoholic Beverages - Civil Offenses - Public Consumption and Possession of Open ContainerDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0397 / CH0306Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses MC 17-17Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 306Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0409Baltimore County - Freedom in Brewing ActDelegate GrammerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1283 / CH0813Alcoholic Beverages - Class 5 Brewery LicenseDelegate BranchEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 813Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0209
    (HB0179 / CH0493)
Frederick County - Beer and Wine Licenses - BarbershopsSenator YoungVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0275Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Village PermitSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0479 / CH0602
    (HB0289 / CH0778)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Marketplace LicenseSenator RobinsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 602Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0491 / CH0318
    (HB0292 / CH0317)
Alcoholic Beverages - Nonrefillable Containers - Draft BeerSenator ReadyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 318Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0937
    (HB0380)
Alcoholic Beverages - Civil Offenses - Public Consumption and Possession of Open ContainerSenator SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Judiciary
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.