Bicycles

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0214
    (SB1123)
Vehicle Laws - Passing Bicycles, Personal Mobility Devices, or Motor ScootersDelegate LaffertyIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/11/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0426Vehicle Laws - Bicycles and Motor Scooters - Use of Bike LanesDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1013 / CH0036
    (SB0908)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016Delegate BeidleGubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 36Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1043Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road - Lane ChangesDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0908
    (HB1013 / CH0036)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016Senator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB1123
    (HB0214)
Vehicle Laws - Passing Bicycles, Personal Mobility Devices, or Motor ScootersSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.