Birds

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0066 / CH0433
    (SB0002 / CH0432)
Dorchester County - Turkey Hunting on Public Land - SundaysDorchester County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 433Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0273
    (SB0089)
Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - SundaysDelegate JacobsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0612
    (SB0787)
Queen Anne's County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - SundaysSenator HersheyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0756
    (SB0860)
State Birds - Oriole and RavenDelegate OaksIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0865
    (SB0037)
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of CostsDelegate MurphyIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1047
    (SB0530)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Patterson Park Audubon CenterDelegate HammenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0002 / CH0432
    (HB0066 / CH0433)
Dorchester County - Turkey Hunting on Public Land - SundaysSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 432Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0037
    (HB0865)
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Payment of CostsSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0089
    (HB0273)
Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - SundaysSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0530
    (HB1047)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Patterson Park Audubon CenterSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0619Wildlife Management and Sustainability Act of 2013Senator AstleIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0754Hunting - Schools - Expanded Safety ZoneSenator MillerIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledJudicial ProceedingsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0787
    (HB0612)
Queen Anne's County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - SundaysSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0860
    (HB0756)
State Birds - Oriole and RavenSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.