Birds

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0061
    (SB1052)
State Designations - State Waterfowl - Canvasback DuckDelegate LisantiIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0126 / CH0102Natural Resources - Wildlife and HuntingChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 102Environment and Transportation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0305 / CH0304
    (SB0628)
Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - SundaysDelegate JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 304Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0602
    (SB0422)
Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017Delegate RobinsonIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAgriculture (M4)
HB0655
    (SB0519 / CH0494)
Frederick County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and MammalsFrederick County DelegationIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1097
    (SB1008)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Phoenix Wildlife CenterDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0422
    (HB0602)
Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017Senator PinskyIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0519 / CH0494
    (HB0655)
Frederick County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and MammalsSenator YoungApproved by the Governor - Chapter 494Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0628
    (HB0305 / CH0304)
Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - SundaysSenator HersheyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB1008
    (HB1097)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Phoenix Wildlife CenterSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1052
    (HB0061)
State Designations - State Waterfowl - Canvasback DuckSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB1158 / CH0372Department of Natural Resources - Solar Generation Facilities - Pollinator-Friendly DesignationSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 372Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 8, 2017 2:49 P.M.