Birth Control

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0613 / CH0820
    (SB0363 / CH0821)
Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and DispensingDelegate HettlemanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 820Health and Government Operations
2/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1159
    (SB0814)
Pharmacists - Dispensing of Prescription Drugs - Single Dispensing of Dosage UnitsDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1205Public Institutions of Higher Education - Access of Students to Emergency ContraceptionDelegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Higher Education (F2)
SB0052
    (HB1245)
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Disposable Medical Supplies and CondomsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/18/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0363 / CH0821
    (HB0613 / CH0820)
Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and DispensingSenator ConwayEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0814
    (HB1159)
Pharmacists - Dispensing of Prescription Drugs - Single Dispensing of Dosage UnitsSenator RosapepeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:58 A.M.