Blind Persons

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0021
    (SB0119)
Property Tax - Exemption for Blind Individuals and Surviving SpousesDelegate VitaleIn the House - Hearing 1/16 at 11:00 a.m.Ways and Means
1/16/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0516Office of Legislative Audits - Fiscal/Compliance Audits - Blind Industries and Services of MarylandDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsState Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0550
    (SB0365)
Income Tax Credit - Web Site Modifications - Accessibility for the BlindDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1023Public Ethics - Blind Industries and Services of MarylandDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
HB1176 / CH0471
    (SB0461 / CH0470)
Primary and Secondary Education - Online Courses and Services - AccessibilityDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 471Ways and Means
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
SB0119
    (HB0021)
Property Tax - Exemption for Blind Individuals and Surviving SpousesSenator ReillyIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0365
    (HB0550)
Income Tax Credit - Web Site Modifications - Accessibility for the BlindSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0461 / CH0470
    (HB1176 / CH0471)
Primary and Secondary Education - Online Courses and Services - AccessibilitySenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 470Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0934
    (HB1372 / CH0430)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.