Blind Persons

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0172
    (SB0778)
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving VehiclesDelegate BeidleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0349 / CH0415
    (SB0894)
Procurement Preferences - Pricing and Selection CommitteesDelegate Robinson, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0398Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic InjuryDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0535 / CH0430
    (SB0538)
Blind or Visually Impaired Children - Individualized Education Programs - Orientation and Mobility InstructionDelegate TurnerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0226Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Blind Individuals and Surviving SpousesSenator ReillyIn the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0479Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic InjurySenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0538
    (HB0535 / CH0430)
Blind or Visually Impaired Children - Individualized Education Programs - Orientation and Mobility InstructionSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0894
    (HB0349 / CH0415)
Procurement Preferences - Pricing and Selection CommitteesSenator PughIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsState Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.