Blind Persons

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0366 / CH0102
    (SB0048)
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Blind IndividualsAnne Arundel County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 102Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0709 / CH0672
    (SB0422 / CH0671)
Education - Maryland School for the Blind - FundingDelegate JonesEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 672Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0742Environment - Water Service Shut Off Protection ActDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0869
    (SB0574)
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic InjuryDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0976CINA, Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Disability of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or PartyDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesJudiciary
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesFamily Law (D4)
HB1375Public Schools and Libraries - Access to Obscene Materials and Child Pornography - ProhibitedDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0048
    (HB0366 / CH0102)
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Blind IndividualsAnne Arundel County SenatorsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0422 / CH0671
    (HB0709 / CH0672)
Education - Maryland School for the Blind - FundingSenator KasemeyerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 671Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0574
    (HB0869)
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic InjurySenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0704CINA Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Blindness of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or PartySenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
SB0765 / CH0423CINA, Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Disability of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or PartySenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 423Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0880Task Force to Study Welfare Reform in MarylandSenator JenningsIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.