Blind Persons

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0438
    (SB0253)
Legislative Transparency Act of 2017SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0458
    (SB0604)
Visual Impairments - Requirements for Teacher Training, Student Screening, and Maryland Medical Assistance Program CoverageDelegate KittlemanIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Health (J1)
HB0846 / CH0342Pricing and Selection Committee for Blind Industries and Services of Maryland and the Employment Works Program - StaffDelegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 342Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0859Business Regulation - Trader's and Chain Stores Licenses and Personal Property Tax - Fees and ExemptionsDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1140
    (SB0439)
State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual AccessDelegate PlattIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1446 / CH0635
    (SB1144)
Procurement Preferences - Blind Industries and Services of Maryland - Janitorial ProductsDelegate HayesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 635Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0225Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Catastrophic InjurySenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0253
    (HB0438)
Legislative Transparency Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0439
    (HB1140)
State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual AccessSenator ConwayIn the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0604
    (HB0458)
Visual Impairments - Requirements for School Personnel Training, Student Screening, and Maryland Medical Assistance Program CoverageSenator BatesIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Health (J1)
SB1092Public Assistance Fraud Prevention ActSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB1144
    (HB1446 / CH0635)
Procurement Preferences - Blind Industries and Services of Maryland - Janitorial ProductsSenator RobinsonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:15 P.M.