Blue Laws

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0066 / CH0433
    (SB0002 / CH0432)
Dorchester County - Turkey Hunting on Public Land - SundaysDorchester County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 433Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0069 / CH0007
    (SB0006 / CH0006)
Dorchester County - Restriction on Sunday Gaming - RepealDorchester County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 7Ways and Means
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0214 / CH0357Queen Anne's County - Deer Hunting on Private Property - SundaysSenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 357Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0272
    (SB0041)
Kent County - Deer Hunting on Private Property - SundaysDelegate JacobsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0273
    (SB0089)
Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - SundaysDelegate JacobsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0275 / CH0461
    (SB0349 / CH0460)
Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013Wicomico County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 461Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0464 / CH0245
    (SB0371 / CH0244)
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday SalesDelegate BeitzelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 245Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0543 / CH0618Carroll County - Deer Hunting - SundaysCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 618Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0612
    (SB0787)
Queen Anne's County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - SundaysSenator HersheyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0749 / CH0387
    (SB0767)
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Permits, and Other AuthorizationsDelegate BeitzelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 387Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1078Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Off-Sale Permit PG 302-13Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1366Alcoholic Beverages - Class CS Chain Store LicensesDelegate BarnesIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1448 / CH0338Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday SalesCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 338Economic Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0002 / CH0432
    (HB0066 / CH0433)
Dorchester County - Turkey Hunting on Public Land - SundaysSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 432Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0006 / CH0006
    (HB0069 / CH0007)
Dorchester County - Restriction on Sunday Gaming - RepealSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 6Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0024Queen Anne's County - Deer Hunting on Private Property - SundaysSenator PipkinVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0041
    (HB0272)
Kent County - Deer Hunting on Private Property - SundaysSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0089
    (HB0273)
Kent County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - SundaysSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0349 / CH0460
    (HB0275 / CH0461)
Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013Senator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 460Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0371 / CH0244
    (HB0464 / CH0245)
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday SalesSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 244Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0767
    (HB0749 / CH0387)
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Permits, and Other AuthorizationsSenator EdwardsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0787
    (HB0612)
Queen Anne's County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - SundaysSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB1004 / CH0337Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday SalesCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 337Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.