Blue Laws

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0022 / CH0754
    (SB0809 / CH0755)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Sale - References to Park Heights Redevelopment AreaDelegate GibsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 754Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0044Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Hours of SaleDelegate AliIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0177 / CH0124Montgomery County – Alcoholic Beverages – Inspections, Food Sales Requirements, and Hours and Days of Sale MC 5–18Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 124Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0178 / CH0125Montgomery County Alcohol Modernization Act of 2018 MC 4-18Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 125Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0206
    (SB0518)
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License - Movie Theaters PG 303-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0506 / CH0094
    (SB0220 / CH0093)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Arena LicenseFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 94Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0518Alcoholic Beverages - Reform on Tap Act of 2018Chair, Economic Matters CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0610 / CH0266
    (SB0275 / CH0267)
Carroll County - Gaming - Repeal of Sunday ProhibitionCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 266Ways and Means
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0745
    (SB0519 / CH0537)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A-7 LicenseBaltimore City DelegationIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0975Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday SalesDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1001 / CH0136Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales at a Bar or CounterHarford County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 136Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1484Calvert County - Class NB Instant Bingo LicenseCalvert County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1586 / CH0088
    (SB0355 / CH0087)
Wicomico County - Motorcycles - Sunday SalesDelegate AndertonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 88Economic Matters
3/12/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0220 / CH0093
    (HB0506 / CH0094)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Arena LicenseSenator YoungApproved by the Governor - Chapter 93Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0243
    (HB0470)
Baltimore City – Park Heights Redevelopment Area – Alcoholic BeveragesSenator RobinsonIn the House - First Reading Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0275 / CH0267
    (HB0610 / CH0266)
Carroll County - Gaming - Repeal of Sunday ProhibitionCarroll County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 267Budget and Taxation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0355 / CH0087
    (HB1586 / CH0088)
Wicomico County - Motorcycles - Sunday SalesSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 87Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0518
    (HB0206)
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Family Entertainment Permit and Class BLX License for Movie TheatersSenator RosapepeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0519 / CH0537
    (HB0745)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A-7 LicenseSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 537Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0609Class 5 Breweries - Hours of Sale for On-Premises ConsumptionSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0809 / CH0755
    (HB0022 / CH0754)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Hours of Sale - References to Park Heights Redevelopment AreaSenator RobinsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 755Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:39 A.M.