Boats and Ships

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0412
    (SB0451)
Vessel Excise Tax - Exemption for Commercial Enterprises Paying the Admissions and Amusement TaxDelegate GeorgeIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0514Recreational Hunting or Fishing License Applications - Disclosure of InformationDelegate O'DonnellIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0548
    (SB0090 / CH0180)
Natural Resources - Vessel Excise Tax - Maximum TaxDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0660
    (SB0827)
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013Delegate DavisIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0954
    (SB0763)
Property and Casualty Insurance - Vessel Liability Coverage - RequiredDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1046Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway FundsDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1127 / CH0303
    (SB0634 / CH0302)
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage FacilitiesDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 303Economic Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB1453Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and TaxationDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1505 / CH0689
    (SB1032)
Oysters - Power Dredging - Time PeriodDelegate JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 689Environmental Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0011 / CH0162Natural Resources - State Boat Act - Expiration of Temporary Certificate of Boat NumberSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 162Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/23/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0074Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or DrugsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0090 / CH0180
    (HB0548)
Natural Resources - Vessel Excise Tax - Waterway Improvement FundSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 180Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0451
    (HB0412)
Vessel Excise Tax - Exemption for Commercial Enterprises Paying the Admissions and Amusement TaxSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0634 / CH0302
    (HB1127 / CH0303)
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage FacilitiesSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 302Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0763
    (HB0954)
Property and Casualty Insurance - Vessel Liability Coverage - RequiredSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0780Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage AgentsSenator PetersIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0827
    (HB0660)
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013Senator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB1032
    (HB1505 / CH0689)
Oysters - Power Dredging - Time PeriodSenator ColburnIn the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.