Boats and Ships

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0295 / CH0671Criminal Procedure - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Impaired BoatingDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 671Judiciary
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0393Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - PenaltiesDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0486
    (SB1041)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Chesapeake Region Accessible Boating ProjectDelegate BuschIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0489Operating a Vehicle or Vessel - Injury to Others While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or DrugsDelegate Wilson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0585
    (SB1114)
Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal NegligenceDelegate CarozzaIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0635 / CH0168
    (SB0229 / CH0167)
Criminal Law - Homicide by Motor Vehicle or Vessel While Impaired by a Controlled Dangerous Substance - PenaltiesDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 168Judiciary
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0885Environment - Chesapeake Bay - Vessel Sewage Discharge AreasDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0907
    (SB0850)
Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation NetworkDelegate LisantiIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1253 / CH0408State Boat Act - Removal of Abandoned or Sunken VesselsDelegate LongApproved by the Governor - Chapter 408Environment and Transportation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1378Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Building a Maryland Inclusive Maritime FacilityDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1408Criminal Law - Controlled Dangerous Substances - Places of UseDelegate SanchezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1434Business Regulation - Marina Fuel Sales - Fuel SalesDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1453Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Skipjack Martha LewisDelegate LisantiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1609
    (SB1147)
State Boat Act - Vessel Operation - Prohibition When Individual on the Bow, Gunwale, or TransomDelegate CarozzaIn the House - Rereferred to Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0030Vessels - Operating While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or DrugsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0059 / CH0401Crabs - Harvest Times - HolidaysSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 401Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0081Interstate Boating Violator CompactSenator SimonaireIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0181Task Force to Study Data Sharing Among the Maryland Judiciary, the Maryland Parole Commission, and the Department of Natural ResourcesSenator SimonaireIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Rules and Executive NominationsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0229 / CH0167
    (HB0635 / CH0168)
Criminal Law - Homicide by Motor Vehicle or Vessel While Impaired by Controlled Dangerous Substance - PenaltiesSenator CassillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 167Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0850
    (HB0907)
Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation NetworkSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB1041
    (HB0486)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Chesapeake Region Accessible Boating ProjectSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1080State Boat Act - Privilege to Operate a Vessel - Suspension AuthoritySenator SimonaireIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
JudiciaryNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB1114
    (HB0585)
Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal NegligenceSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB1147
    (HB1609)
State Boat Act - Vessel Operation - Prohibition When Individual on the Bow, Gunwale, or TransomSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB1176Creation of a State Debt - St. Mary's County - Maryland DoveSenator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1193Anne Arundel County - Controlled Water Ski Areas in Maynadier Creek - Operation of Vessel - Hours of OperationAnne Arundel County SenatorsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:35 A.M.