Boats and Ships

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0125Criminal Law - Misuse of Laser PointerDelegate FisherIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
1/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0253 / CH0543Motor Vehicles - Automobile TransportersChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 543Environment and Transportation
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0299
    (SB0141)
Anne Arundel County - Controlled Water Ski Areas in Maynadier Creek - Operation of Vessel - Hours of OperationDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0324Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - PenaltiesDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0406
    (SB0734)
Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal NegligenceDelegate CarozzaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0654
    (SB0264)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Maritime Museum and ParkDelegate BuschIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0795
    (SB0046)
Natural Resources – State Boat Act – Carbon Monoxide SafetyDelegate MaloneIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0803
    (SB0019)
Business Regulation - Boat Winterization - Shrink Wrapping (Matthew's Law)Delegate MaloneIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0820Sales and Use Tax - Replacement Boat Motors - ExemptionDelegate MautzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0900 / CH0134Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Clubs, Firehouses, and Multiple Event LicensesHarford County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 134Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1137 / CH0518Natural Resources - Fisheries - Commercial Oyster DiversDelegate JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 518Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1174Natural Resources - Oysters - Tolerance for Seafood DealersDelegate JacobsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1398State Boat Act - Solar Reflective Lights on Buoys - RequirementDelegate MetzgarIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1451 / CH0458
    (SB0767 / CH0459)
Criminal Injuries Compensation - Acts Involving Operation of Vessel or Motor VehicleDelegate VallarioApproved by the Governor - Chapter 458Judiciary
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1677
    (SB0328)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Adaptive Boating CenterDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1772
    (SB1206 / CH0854)
Transportation – Pride of Baltimore II – Funding and ReportingDelegate McIntoshIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationAppropriations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
SB0019
    (HB0803)
Business Regulation - Boat Winterization - Shrink Wrapping (Matthew's Law)Senator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0046
    (HB0795)
Natural Resources – State Boat Act – Carbon Monoxide Safety (Matthew’s Law)Senator ReillyIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0141
    (HB0299)
Anne Arundel County - Controlled Water Ski Areas in Maynadier Creek - Operation of Vessel - Hours of OperationAnne Arundel County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0264
    (HB0654)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Maritime Museum and ParkSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0292 / CH0551Estates - Administration Exemption - Transfer of Motor Vehicle and Boat TitlesSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 551Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0328
    (HB1677)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Adaptive Boating CenterSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0734
    (HB0406)
Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal NegligenceSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0767 / CH0459
    (HB1451 / CH0458)
Criminal Injuries Compensation – Acts Involving Operation of Vessel or Motor VehicleSenator ReadyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 459Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/9/2018 - 7:30 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1206 / CH0854
    (HB1772)
Transportation – Pride of Baltimore II – Funding and ReportingSenator KasemeyerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 854Budget and Taxation
3/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:03 P.M.