Bonds

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0133Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - RenovationChair, Appropriations CommitteeIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0234Land Use – Public Nuisance – Surety Bond Requirement (Developer Accountability Act)Delegate GrammerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0546 / CH0817
    (SB0278 / CH0818)
Prevailing Wage - Tax Increment Financing Developments - ApplicationDelegate DavisEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 817Economic Matters
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0564
    (SB0432)
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Governing BodiesDelegate HolmesIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0596
    (SB0234 / CH0470)
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure CompactDelegate HillIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0848 / CH0480Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Reporting AgenciesChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 480Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0942Real Property – Body Attachments – Debt Related to Residential TenancyDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Real Property (N1)
HB1007
    (SB0883)
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and RulesDelegate CullisonIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1065 / CH0512
    (SB0768)
Vehicle Laws - Title Service AgentsDelegate McMillanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 512Environment and Transportation
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1103 / CH0835
    (SB0795 / CH0836)
Higher Education – Private Career Schools, For–Profit Institutions of Higher Education, and For–Profit Online Distance Education Programs – RegulationDelegate HettlemanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 835Appropriations
3/1/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB1158
    (SB1209)
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersDelegate HolmesIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1199Northern Bay CrossingDelegate JacobsIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1456 / CH0626
    (SB1128)
Offshore Drilling Liability ActDelegate BarveApproved by the Governor - Chapter 626Judiciary
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1513Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses ActDelegate FennellIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
HB1653Solar Electric Generating Facility Decommissioning and Restoration - Security - FundDelegate ArentzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0234 / CH0470
    (HB0596)
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure CompactSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 470Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0278 / CH0818
    (HB0546 / CH0817)
Prevailing Wage – Tax Increment Financing Developments – ApplicationSenator FeldmanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 818Finance
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0432
    (HB0564)
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Governing BodiesSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0768
    (HB1065 / CH0512)
Vehicle Laws - Title Service AgentsSenator ReadyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0795 / CH0836
    (HB1103 / CH0835)
Higher Education – Private Career Schools, For–Profit Institutions of Higher Education, and For–Profit Online Distance Education Programs – RegulationSenator PinskyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 836Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0883
    (HB1007)
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and RulesSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB1064 / CH0553Academic Facilities Bonding AuthorityChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 553Budget and Taxation
3/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Capital Budget (B5)
SB1068 / CH0732
    (HB1634 / CH0731)
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018Senator RosapepeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 732Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB1128
    (HB1456 / CH0626)
Offshore Drilling Liability ActSenator MathiasVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1160Procurement – Subcontractors – Bond AmountSenator MuseIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB1209
    (HB1158)
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 5, 2018 3:08 P.M.