Bridges and Tunnels

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0389 / CH0397
    (SB0730)
Maryland Transportation Authority - All-Electronic Tolling - StudyDelegate RudolphApproved by the Governor - Chapter 397Ways and Means
2/6/2014 - 2:15 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0643
    (SB0791)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Toll Charges Paid by Baltimore Area or Chesapeake Bay Bridge CommutersDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0870
    (SB0245)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Toll Charges Paid by Chesapeake Bay Bridge or Hatem Bridge CommutersDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0877Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Maryland Toll ExpensesDelegate WeirIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1177Maryland Transportation Authority - E-ZPass Discount Plans - Removal of Time LimitationsDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1263Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll CollectionDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1382Maryland Transportation Authority - Toll Increases - Legislative Approval RequiredDelegate BromwellIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0245
    (HB0870)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Toll Charges Paid by Chesapeake Bay Bridge or Hatem Bridge CommutersSenator JacobsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0730
    (HB0389 / CH0397)
Maryland Transportation Authority - All-Electronic Tolling - StudySenator JacobsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0791
    (HB0643)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Toll Charges Paid by Baltimore Area or Chesapeake Bay Bridge CommutersSenator StoneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0902Transportation - Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Environmental Impact Study - Cost Estimate and PaymentSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.