Bridges and Tunnels

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0035Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll CollectionDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
1/28/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0073
    (SB0210)
Intercounty Connector - Public School Bus - Exemption From TollDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0240Maryland Transportation Authority - Toll RatesDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/11/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0296Maryland Transportation Authority - Vehicle Not Using Bridge - Toll ProhibitedDelegate GrammerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0611Vehicle Laws - Civil Penalty for Failure to Pay Video Toll - LimitationDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0647
    (SB0543)
Video Lottery Facilities - Charles County - Expansion and Use of ProceedsDelegate JamesonIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0672
    (SB0907)
Transportation - Harry W. Nice Memorial Potomac River Bridge - ReplacementDelegate JamesonIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0964Maryland Transportation Authority - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Toll Discount PlansDelegate MetzgarIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1013 / CH0036
    (SB0908)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016Delegate BeidleGubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 36Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1394Maryland Transportation Authority - Decreases in Tolls or Other Charges - Notice and Public CommentDelegate HixsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0056Transportation - Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Environmental Impact Study - Cost Estimate and PaymentSenator MathiasIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/20/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0061 / CH0043Natural Resources - Forest Lands and the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Miscellaneous Corrections and ClarificationsSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 43Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0210
    (HB0073)
Intercounty Connector - Public School Bus - Exemption From TollSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0416Transportation - Toll Transportation Facilities Project - Annual Pass - StudySenator SallingIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationFinance
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0500Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge AuthoritySenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0543
    (HB0647)
Video Lottery Facilities - Charles County - Expansion and Use of ProceedsSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0907
    (HB0672)
Transportation - Harry W. Nice Memorial Potomac River Bridge - ReplacementSenator MiddletonVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Finance
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0908
    (HB1013 / CH0036)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016Senator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.