Bridges and Tunnels

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0049Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll CollectionDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
1/26/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0082 / CH0681
    (SB0125 / CH0682)
Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - RepealDelegate CarrApproved by the Governor - Chapter 681Environment and Transportation
2/9/2017 - 1:15 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0290 / CH0719
    (SB0536)
Maryland Transportation Authority - Third Generation-Electronic Toll Collection SystemDelegate GrammerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 719Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0402
    (SB0307 / CH0030)
Repeal of the Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016 (Road Kill Bill Repeal)SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)Appropriations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0466
    (SB0870)
Prevailing Wage - Tax Increment Financing Developments - ApplicationDelegate McCrayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0951 / CH0711
    (SB1157 / CH0712)
State Highway Administration - Alfred B. Hilton Memorial Bridge - DedicationDelegate LisantiApproved by the Governor - Chapter 711Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0125 / CH0682
    (HB0082 / CH0681)
Woodrow Wilson Bridge and Tunnel Compact - RepealSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 682Finance
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0292Transportation - Baltimore Harbor Tunnel, Fort McHenry Tunnel, and Francis Scott Key Bridge - Annual Pass StudySenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0307 / CH0030
    (HB0402)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act - Application and EvaluationPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 30Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0536
    (HB0290 / CH0719)
Maryland Transportation Authority - Third Generation-Electronic Toll Collection SystemSenator SallingIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsTransportation - Highways (R1)
SB0870
    (HB0466)
Prevailing Wage - Tax Increment Financing Developments - ApplicationSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB1157 / CH0712
    (HB0951 / CH0711)
State Highway Administration - Alfred B. Hilton Memorial Bridge - DedicationSenator CassillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 712Finance
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationTransportation - Highways (R1)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:44 A.M.