Bridges and Tunnels

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0004 / CH0020Toll Bridges – Renaming Harry W. Nice Memorial Bridge – Harry W. Nice/Thomas "Mac" Middleton BridgeDelegate JamesonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20Environment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0009 / CH0278Transportation - Dedication of StructuresDelegate FoldenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 278Environment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0372 / CH0352
    (SB0277 / CH0351)
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding ActDelegate KormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 352Appropriations
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0377Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll CollectionDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0548
    (SB1073)
Privately Owned Transportation Projects - Construction and Authorization to Use State-Owned Rights-of-Way and Property - RequirementsDelegate HealeyVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0560
    (SB0034)
Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Eastern Shore Local Government Consent - RepealDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0816 / CH0830Public-Private Partnership Agreements - Compensation Provisions and Noncompete Clauses - AlterationsDelegate LiermanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 830Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0977State Highway Administration Neighbor Notification ActDelegate WilkinsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1199Northern Bay CrossingDelegate JacobsIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1332Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge - Commuter PlanDelegate MetzgarIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0034
    (HB0560)
Chesapeake Bay Bridge Crossing - Eastern Shore Local Government Consent - RepealSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.Finance
1/24/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0277 / CH0351
    (HB0372 / CH0352)
Maryland Metro/Transit Funding ActSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 351Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0885 / CH0622Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Condemnation of Land Under EasementSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 622Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0935Maryland Transportation Authority - Broening Highway/Authority Drive Toll Facility - BypassSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 5, 2018 3:35 P.M.