Budget and Management, Department of

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0102 / CH0425
    (SB0127)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 425Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0136 / CH0083State Personnel - Teleworking - Statewide Program and GoalsDelegate Miller, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83Appropriations
2/5/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0185
    (SB0843)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Health Improvement and Cost Savings Act of 2013Delegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0258
    (SB0800)
Task Force to Study Phased Retirement for Maryland State EmployeesDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 8:30 a.m.Appropriations
2/5/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 a.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0391
    (SB0224 / CH0208)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Wellness ProgramDelegate KrebsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0632Family Investment Program - State Government Hiring Plans - ApplicationDelegate Kelly, K.In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0665 / CH0131State Personnel - Law Enforcement Employees - Extra CompensationDelegate DeBoyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 131Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0790State Employees - Collective Bargaining - Judicial Branch EmployeesDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsState Government - Personnel (P4)
HB1119 / CH0317
    (SB0752 / CH0316)
Department of Budget and Management - Foster Youth Summer Internship Pilot ProgramDelegate ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 317Appropriations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB1213
    (SB0724)
State Personnel - Program to Improve Employee to Supervisor Ratio and Employee Span of Control Review BoardDelegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB1302Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and FairnessDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB1337 / CH0530
    (SB0702 / CH0529)
Maryland Public Art Initiative Program - Selection of Art for Capital ProjectsDelegate GriffithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 530Health and Government Operations
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1363State Law Enforcement Officers - Compensatory Leave - Cash Compensation and Creditable ServiceDelegate ClusterIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0004 / CH0160State Personnel - Applicants for Employment - Criminal History Records ChecksSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 160Finance
1/16/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0085 / CH0021Maryland Port Commission - Management Personnel Appointments - Operating and Managing Port FacilitiesChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 21Finance
1/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0224 / CH0208
    (HB0391)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Wellness ProgramSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 208Finance
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0702 / CH0529
    (HB1337 / CH0530)
Maryland Public Art Initiative Program - Selection of Art for Capital ProjectsSenator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 529Finance
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0724
    (HB1213)
State Personnel - Program to Improve Employee to Supervisor Ratio and Employee Span of Control Review BoardSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0752 / CH0316
    (HB1119 / CH0317)
Department of Budget and Management - Foster Youth Summer Internship Pilot ProgramSenator RobeyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 316Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0800
    (HB0258)
Task Force to Study Phased Retirement for Maryland State EmployeesSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0831State Budget - Evidence-Based Policy OptionsSenator KasemeyerIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0843
    (HB0185)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Health Improvement and Cost Savings Act of 2013Senator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceState Government - Personnel (P4)
SB1055State Aid for Critical Services - County Maintenance of Effort RequirementsSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.