Budget and Management, Department of

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0120 / CH0095State Budget - Department of Budget and Management - Statement of Dedicated State FundsDelegate KrimmApproved by the Governor - Chapter 95Appropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
HB0353Reorganization of State ProcurementDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0381
    (SB0321 / CH0064)
State Retirement and Pension System - Board of Trustees - Designee Appointments and Fiduciary DutiesDelegate Barnes, B.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/2/2016 - 12:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0458
    (SB0380)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0462 / CH0010
    (SB0383)
Program Open Space - Transfer Tax Repayment - Use of FundsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 10Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0709 / CH0672
    (SB0422 / CH0671)
Education - Maryland School for the Blind - FundingDelegate JonesEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 672Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0837 / CH0066
    (SB0342 / CH0065)
State Finance and Procurement - Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Policies Concerning Procurement ContractsDelegate HaynesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 66Health and Government Operations
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0909Task Force to Study Paid Parental Leave PoliciesDelegate Miller, A.In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB1104
    (SB0689)
Task Force on Workplace Bullying in State AgenciesDelegate Young, P.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB1106
    (SB0921)
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard RevisionsDelegate FrickVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Economic Matters
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1162 / CH0079
    (SB0785 / CH0078)
Foster Youth Summer Internship ProgramDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 79Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB1193
    (SB0067)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsDelegate PlattIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1464
    (SB0927)
Program Open Space Trust Fund Act of 2016Delegate GainesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1474
    (SB1038)
Economic Development - Maryland Stadium Authority - Downtown Frederick Conference CenterDelegate KrimmIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0067
    (HB1193)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsSenator YoungIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-0)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0090 / CH0342Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits and Penalties for FraudChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 342Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Unemployment Insurance (K2)
SB0321 / CH0064
    (HB0381)
State Retirement and Pension System - Board of Trustees - Designee Appointments and Fiduciary DutiesSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 64Budget and Taxation
2/11/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0342 / CH0065
    (HB0837 / CH0066)
State Finance and Procurement - Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Policies Concerning Procurement ContractsSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 65Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0370 / CH0014
    (HB0368 / CH0015)
Board of Public Works Transparency Act of 2016Senator MadalenoEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 14Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0380
    (HB0458)
General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0422 / CH0671
    (HB0709 / CH0672)
Education - Maryland School for the Blind - FundingSenator KasemeyerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 671Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0689
    (HB1104)
Task Force on Workplace Bullying in State AgenciesSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0785 / CH0078
    (HB1162 / CH0079)
Foster Youth Summer Internship ProgramSenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 78Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0875State Retirement and Pension System - Disability Benefits StudySenator SerafiniIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsBudget and Taxation
3/10/2016 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0921
    (HB1106)
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard RevisionsSenator PughVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Finance
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0927
    (HB1464)
Program Open Space Trust Fund Act of 2016Senator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB1038
    (HB1474)
Economic Development - Maryland Stadium Authority - Downtown Frederick Conference CenterSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.