Budget and Management, Department of

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0104Central Collection Unit - Collection of Debt - LiensChair, Appropriations CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0152 / CH0023
    (SB0172)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0324
    (SB0580 / CH0680)
State Personnel - Leap Year - Personal LeaveDelegate KormanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0450
    (SB0568)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Prescription Drugs and Devices - Copayment or Coinsurance RequirementsDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0614
    (SB0483)
State Personnel - Employees in the Same Classification - Pay RatesDelegate HettlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0895
    (SB0655)
Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support PaymentsDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Horse Racing (C6)
HB0966Legislative and Congressional DistrictingDelegate HillIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1021 / CH0590Reorganization of State ProcurementDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 590Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1161
    (SB0921)
State Personnel - Special Appointments in the Skilled and Professional ServicesDelegate JonesIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/2/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB1192Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersDelegate DavisIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1193Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersDelegate HolmesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersReal Property (N1)
SB0483
    (HB0614)
State Personnel - Employees in the Same Classification - Pay RatesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0530Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0568
    (HB0450)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Prescription Drugs and Devices - Copayment or Coinsurance RequirementsSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceState Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0580 / CH0680
    (HB0324)
State Personnel - Leap Year - Personal LeaveSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 680Finance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0655
    (HB0895)
Horse Racing - Prizes - Intercepts for Restitution and Child Support PaymentsSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Horse Racing (C6)
SB0839Workgroup on Categories for Funding Priorities in the Annual State BudgetSenator SerafiniIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersBudget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersOperating Budget (B1)
SB0921
    (HB1161)
State Personnel - Special Appointments in the Skilled and Professional ServicesSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB1024 / CH0607
    (HB0684 / CH0006)
Education - State Grants for Education AidSenator McFaddenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 607Budget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1084 / CH0709
    (HB0587 / CH0708)
State Finance and Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Definitions and PenaltiesSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 709Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:34 A.M.