Building Codes

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0469
    (SB0018)
Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Inspections (Jonathan's Law)Delegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0637 / CH0626Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - High Performance Buildings MC/PG 101-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 626Environmental Matters
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0653 / CH0631Charles County - Building Code - Abatement of ViolationsCharles County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 631Environmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0769 / CH0537
    (SB0750 / CH0536)
Public Safety - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Local Wind Design and Wind-Borne Debris StandardsDelegate MaloneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 537Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1279 / CH0410
    (SB0902)
Statewide Building Codes - Maryland Accessibility Code - EnforcementDelegate NiemannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 410Environmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1511
    (SB1042)
Washington County Building Code Board of Appeals - DecisionsWashington County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0018
    (HB0469)
Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Inspections (Jonathan's Law)Senator YoungIn the Senate - Third Reading Failed (21-25)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0028Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance AbatementSenator YoungIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersJudicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0750 / CH0536
    (HB0769 / CH0537)
Public Safety - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Local Wind Design and Wind-Borne Debris StandardsSenator RobeyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 536Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0902
    (HB1279 / CH0410)
Statewide Building Codes - Maryland Accessibility Code - EnforcementSenator MuseIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (99-37)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental MattersPublic Safety (E4)
SB1042
    (HB1511)
Washington County Building Code Board of Appeals - DecisionsSenator ShankIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.