Burglary

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0477Firearms - Conviction for Crime of Violence - Probation Before JudgmentDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0478
    (SB0861)
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - PenaltiesDelegate SimmonsIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0940
    (SB0248)
Criminal Law - Home Invasion Violent Crime and Armed Home Invasion Violent CrimeDelegate LeeIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0985
    (SB0722)
Criminal Law - Third Degree Sexual Offense - BurglaryDelegate ClippingerIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0248
    (HB0940)
Criminal Law - Home Invasion Violent Crime and Armed Home Invasion Violent CrimeSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0722
    (HB0985)
Criminal Law - Third Degree Sexual Offense - BurglarySenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0861
    (HB0478)
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - PenaltiesSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.