Buses

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0162Comptroller - Taxpayer Protection ActChair, Judiciary CommitteeIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Judiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0777Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - ProhibitionDelegate Wilson, B.In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0891
    (SB1035)
Maryland Transit Administration - Farebox Recovery Rate - RepealDelegate LiermanIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1486Workgroup on Transportation for Middle and High School Students in Prince George's County PG 440-16Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1607
    (SB1052 / CH0025)
University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016Delegate AndersonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHigher Education (F2)
SB0183School Vehicles - Seat Belts - RequirementsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0199Transit and Transportation Service - Audio Recordings - Requirements and LimitationsSenator BrochinIn the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB1035
    (HB0891)
Transportation - Transit Service - State Grants and Farebox Recovery RateSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB1052 / CH0025
    (HB1607)
University of Maryland Strategic Partnership Act of 2016Senator FergusonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 25Budget and Taxation
3/1/2016 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.