Business and Economic Development, Department of

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0473
    (SB0787)
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive ZonesDelegate SummersIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0520
    (SB1051)
Business and Economic Development - Film Production Activity Tax Credit ProgramChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0616Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit AmountsChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0741 / CH0533
    (SB0601 / CH0532)
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative ProgramDelegate BohananApproved by the Governor - Chapter 533Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0742 / CH0531
    (SB0600 / CH0530)
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone ProgramDelegate WalkerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 531Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0765 / CH0613State Personnel - Authority to Set CompensationChair, Appropriations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 613Appropriations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB1060 / CH0571
    (SB0889 / CH0570)
Northeastern Maryland Additive Manufacturing Innovation AuthorityDelegate JamesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 571Economic Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1086State Aid - Business Transparency and Financial Disclosure ActDelegate McMillanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:45 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1220Procurement - Real Estate Development Projects - Minority Business Enterprise ParticipationDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1251
    (SB0921)
Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program and TrustDelegate HuckerIn the House - Reassigned to Economic Matters and AppropriationsEconomic Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1262
    (SB0633)
Maryland Education CreditDelegate MitchellIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1324Maryland Youth Employment Act of 2014Delegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0146Business and Economic Development - Foreign Trade Zones - InformationSenator ReillyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersFinance
1/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0570 / CH0525Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit AmountsSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 525Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0600 / CH0530
    (HB0742 / CH0531)
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone ProgramSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 530Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0601 / CH0532
    (HB0741 / CH0533)
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative ProgramSenator MillerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 532Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0633
    (HB1262)
Maryland Education CreditSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0735Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization ProgramSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0787
    (HB0473)
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive ZonesSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0889 / CH0570
    (HB1060 / CH0571)
Northeastern Maryland Additive Manufacturing Innovation AuthoritySenator JenningsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 570Finance
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0921
    (HB1251)
Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program and TrustSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 8:30 a.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/20/2014 - 8:30 a.m.
Finance
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB1051
    (HB0520)
Business and Economic Development - Film Production Activity Tax Credit ProgramSenator KasemeyerIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedBudget and Taxation
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.