Calvert County

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0007 / CH0346Southern Maryland Higher Education Council - ModificationsDelegate BohananApproved by the Governor - Chapter 346Appropriations
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0083
    (SB0239 / CH0034)
Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District CourtSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0802
    (SB0458 / CH0056)
Calvert County - Public Facilities BondsCalvert County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB0822
    (SB0656 / CH0516)
Calvert County - Property Tax - Natural Gas FacilityCalvert County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0978 / CH0396Alcoholic Beverages - Winery Off-Site Permit and Wine Festival PermitDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 396Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1019 / CH0293
    (SB0586 / CH0292)
Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Hub and Spoke Program in the Southern Maryland RegionDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 293Environmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAgriculture (M4)
HB1273Education - Calvert County Board of Education - Annual AuditCalvert County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1292 / CH0411Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses and AppealsDelegate O'DonnellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 411Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1448 / CH0338Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday SalesCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 338Economic Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0113Creation of a State Debt - Calvert County - North Beach Pier ImprovementsSenator MillerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0239 / CH0034
    (HB0083)
Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District CourtPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 34Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0304 / CH0223Calvert County - Election Judges - CompensationSenator MillerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 223Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0457Calvert County - Local Forest Conservation Fund - Administrative CostsCalvert County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0458 / CH0056
    (HB0802)
Calvert County - Public Facilities BondsCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 56Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0511Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - FinesCalvert County SenatorsIn the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0586 / CH0292
    (HB1019 / CH0293)
Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Hub and Spoke Program in the Southern Maryland RegionSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 292Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0656 / CH0516
    (HB0822)
Calvert County - Property Tax - Natural Gas FacilitySenator MillerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 516Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0729 / CH0310Calvert County - County Commissioners - Method of ElectionCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 310Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0737Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event LicensesCalvert County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0789Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise ParticipationSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0934
    (HB1372 / CH0430)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB1004 / CH0337Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday SalesCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 337Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.