Calvert County

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0296 / CH0465
    (SB0336)
Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New WildlandsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 465Environmental Matters
2/5/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0394Economic Development - Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - ReorganizationDelegate BohananIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0573Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - ExemptionDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0759Calvert County - Deer Hunting - SundaysCalvert County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1037Calvert County - Zoning - Target RangesDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1054Calvert County - Board of License Commissioners - Notice and Hearing on Proposed LegislationCalvert County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1056Calvert County - Length of Service Award - Fire Fighters, Rescue Squad Members, and Rescue Dive Team Members - Increase AuthorizedCalvert County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1079 / CH0487Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container PermitCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 487Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1083
    (SB0670)
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - GleaningDelegate JamesonIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1106Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Volunteer Fire Companies and Fraternal OrganizationsCalvert County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1107Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bottle Clubs - ProhibitionsCalvert County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1133Calvert County and St. Mary's County - Archery Hunting - Safety ZoneDelegate O'DonnellIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1184
    (SB0168 / CH0043)
Calvert County - Public Facilities BondsCalvert County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB1297Calvert County and St. Mary's County - Task Force to Study the Use and Trade of Illicit Opioids in Traditionally Rural CountiesDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1436Calvert County - Salaries of County Officials and County Commissioner Retirement Plan ParticipationCalvert County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0168 / CH0043
    (HB1184)
Calvert County - Public Facilities BondsCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 43Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0291Creation of a State Debt - Calvert County - Bayfront Park and Sculptural GardenSenator MillerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2014 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0336
    (HB0296 / CH0465)
Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New WildlandsPresidentVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0339Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - License ApplicationsCalvert County SenatorsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0340 / CH0292Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Unlicensed Establishments - ProhibitionsCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 292Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0341 / CH0486Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container PermitCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 486Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0495 / CH0512Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Premises Inspections and PenaltiesCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 512Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0496 / CH0513Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Organizational LicensesCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 513Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0548 / CH0521Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event (Festival) Beer, Wine and Liquor PermitCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 521Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0597Creation of a State Debt - Calvert County - End Hunger WarehouseSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2014 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0611Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event (Charity) Beer, Wine and Liquor LicenseCalvert County SenatorsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0612 / CH0310Calvert County - Salaries of County Officials and County Commissioner Retirement Plan ParticipationCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 310Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0670
    (HB1083)
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - GleaningSenator MiddletonIn the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0673Calvert County - Discharge of a Firearm Near BuildingsCalvert County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledJudicial Proceedings Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0966 / CH0574Charles County and St. Mary's County - Deer HuntingSenator DysonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 574Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.