Calvert County

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0472 / CH0233
    (SB0416 / CH0232)
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot ProgramDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 233Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0930
    (SB0640)
Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight VehiclesDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB1423 / CH0310Calvert County - Board of License Commissioners - Notice and Hearing on Proposed LegislationCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 310Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1426Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - ExemptionDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1439
    (SB0473 / CH0080)
Calvert County - Bonding AuthorityCalvert County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB1440 / CH0146Calvert County - Solid Waste Disposal ContractsCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 146Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1478Calvert County - Competitive Bidding ProcessCalvert County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0179Creation of a State Debt - Calvert County - End Hunger In Calvert County WarehouseSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0352Calvert County - Calvert County Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund - Uses and Funding ExtensionCalvert County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Generally (L1)
SB0416 / CH0232
    (HB0472 / CH0233)
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Food Donation Pilot ProgramSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 232Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0473 / CH0080
    (HB1439)
Calvert County - Bonding AuthorityCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 80Budget and Taxation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0640
    (HB0930)
Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight VehiclesSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0800Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Medical Cannabis Grower Licenses - Review of ApplicationsSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 30, 2017 1:02 P.M.