Calvert County

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0119 / CH0110Calvert County – Hunting – Deer Management PermitsDelegate ClarkApproved by the Governor - Chapter 110Environment and Transportation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0446 / CH0111Calvert County - Fire and Rescue Commission - MembershipCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 111Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0498 / CH0112Calvert County - Salary of Assistant SheriffCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 112Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0627 / CH0113Calvert County - Length of Service Award Program - Death BenefitsCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 113Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0725Calvert County - Budget Changes - Publication and Hearing ThresholdCalvert County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0727 / CH0743State Designations - State Paleontology Collection and Research Center - Calvert Marine MuseumCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 743Health and Government Operations
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0729 / CH0114Calvert County - County Budget - Changes to Adopted BudgetCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 114Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0815 / CH0744Calvert County - Procurement - Contracts and BiddingCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 744Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0918Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - ExemptionDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1084Calvert County - County Superintendent of Schools - Postemployment Compensation and BenefitsCalvert County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1102 / CH0115Calvert County - Bonding Authority - Enterprise FundCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 115Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB1114 / CH0116Calvert County - Procurement Contracts - Reciprocal Preference for Resident BiddersCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 116Health and Government Operations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1251
    (SB0905)
Creation of a State Debt - Calvert County - East-John Youth Center PoolsDelegate ClarkIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1354 / CH0117Calvert County - Bonding AuthorityCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 117Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB1357 / CH0841Calvert County - County Officials - SalariesCalvert County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 841Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1459 / CH0118Calvert County – Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax RevenuesCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 118Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Generally (L1)
HB1484Calvert County - Class NB Instant Bingo LicenseCalvert County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1485 / CH0531Natural Resources - Shellfish - Harvesting by Wharf OwnersDelegate FisherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 531Environment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1580Calvert County - Competitive Bidding ProcessDelegate FisherIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0450 / CH0742State Designations – State Paleontology Collection and Research Center – Calvert Marine MuseumSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 742Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0905
    (HB1251)
Creation of a State Debt - Calvert County - East-John Youth Center PoolsSenator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0961 / CH0420Calvert County - Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax RevenuesCalvert County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 420Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB1106Creation of a State Debt - Calvert County - North Beach Volunteer Fire DepartmentSenator MillerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:03 P.M.