Campaign Financing

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0112 / CH0252Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Expenditures Made and the Attribution of Contributions ReceivedDelegate JacksonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 252Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0156Election Law - Campaign Material - Clarification of DefinitionDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0174Election Law - Campaign Finance Violations - Injunctive ReliefDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0200Election Law - Legislative Newsletters - Distribution by Electronic MailDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0241 / CH0203
    (SB0408 / CH0202)
Election Law - State Elected Officials - Campaign Fund-Raising During General Assembly Session - Civil PenaltyDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 203Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0297Election Law - Business Entity Campaign Contributions - ProhibitionDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0578
    (SB0002)
Real-Time Transparency Act of 2016Delegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0853Election Law - Campaign Finance Entities - Disbursements by Debit and Credit CardsDelegate LisantiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0963 / CH0725
    (SB0459 / CH0726)
Campaign Finance - Ballot Issue Committees - Prospective QuestionsDelegate LuedtkeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 725Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB1164Election Law - Contribution to a Candidate for Judicial OfficeDelegate BuckelIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1201Election Law - Campaign Finance - Coordinated ExpendituresDelegate EbersoleIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1230Election Law - Departmental Secretaries - Political ActivityDelegate TurnerIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsWays and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB1248
    (SB0428)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HJ0008
    (SJ0002)
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy AmendmentDelegate SmithIn the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0002
    (HB0578)
Real-Time Transparency Act of 2016Senator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 3:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0290Election Laws - Loans to a Campaign Finance EntitySenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0328
    (HB0220)
Criminal Procedure - ExpungementSenator ConwayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0408 / CH0202
    (HB0241 / CH0203)
Election Law - State Elected Officials - Campaign Fund-Raising During General Assembly Session - Civil PenaltySenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 202Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0420Election Law - Ballot Issues - Contributions or Donations by Foreign NationalsSenator SimonaireIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0428
    (HB1248)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0459 / CH0726
    (HB0963 / CH0725)
Campaign Finance - Ballot Issue Committees - Prospective QuestionsSenator ConwayEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 726Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0501Shareholders United ActSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
SB0973Election Law - Departmental Secretaries - Solicitation of Contributions or DonationsSenator MadalenoIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (85-52)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SJ0002
    (HJ0008)
United States Constitution - Amendments Convention - Democracy AmendmentSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.