Camps

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0364 / CH0107Swimming Pools - Automated External Defibrillator Programs (Connor's Law)Delegate HuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 107Health and Government Operations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0365 / CH0616Harford County - Archery Hunting - Safety ZoneDelegate GlassApproved by the Governor - Chapter 616Environmental Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0411
    (SB0301)
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Maryland STEM Lab at Broad Creek Memorial Scout ReservationDelegate DeBoyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0918
    (SB0437)
Health - Youth Camps - DefinitionsDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1075
    (SB0657)
Criminal Law - Third Degree Sexual Offense - Person in Position of AuthorityDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1358
    (SB0663)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Camp Woodlands Teepee ProjectDelegate LoveIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1482 / CH0601
    (SB1031 / CH0600)
Hunting - Domesticated Animals - Prohibited ActsDelegate CaneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 601Environmental Matters
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0301
    (HB0411)
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Maryland STEM Lab at Broad Creek Memorial Scout ReservationSenator GlassmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0437
    (HB0918)
Health - Youth Camps - DefinitionsSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0657
    (HB1075)
Criminal Law - Third Degree Sexual Offense - Person in Position of AuthoritySenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0663
    (HB1358)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Camp Woodlands Teepee ProjectSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0934
    (HB1372 / CH0430)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB1031 / CH0600
    (HB1482 / CH0601)
Hunting - Domesticated Animals - Prohibited ActsSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 600Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.