Capital Budgets

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0108
    (SB0457)
Capital Budget - Construction Projects - Apprenticeship RequirementsDelegate McCrayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/3/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Capital Budget (B5)
HB0151
    (SB0191 / CH0027)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2008, 2009, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, and 2015SpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriationsCapital Budget (B5)
HB0309
    (SB0324 / CH0013)
Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2016Delegate BuschIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledAppropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0949
    (SB0897)
Cemeteries - Perpetual Care Trust Fund - Loan of Principal for Capital ExpendituresDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1131Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Budget Approval PG/MC 104-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB1350
    (SB0707 / CH0420)
Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and DefinitionDelegate HammenIn the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)Health and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0191 / CH0027
    (HB0151)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2016, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2014, and 2015PresidentEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 27Budget and TaxationAppropriationsCapital Budget (B5)
SB0324 / CH0013
    (HB0309)
Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2016Senator MillerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 13Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0457
    (HB0108)
Capital Budget - Construction Projects - Apprenticeship RequirementsSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
Budget and Taxation
Capital Budget (B5)
SB0707 / CH0420
    (HB1350)
Freestanding Medical Facilities - Certificate of Need, Rates, and DefinitionSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 420Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0737Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax CreditSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0738Economic Development - Maryland Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax CreditSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0897
    (HB0949)
Cemeteries - Perpetual Care Trust Fund - Loan of Principal for Capital ExpendituresSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.