Capital Budgets

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0074 / CH0021
    (SB0782 / CH0087)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014 - Baltimore County - Chesapeake High StadiumDelegate GrammerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21Appropriations
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB0151 / CH0022
    (SB0171)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2017, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2006, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, and 2016SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22AppropriationsBudget and TaxationCapital Budget (B5)
HB0467 / CH0782
    (SB0699)
Providing Our Workers Education and Readiness (POWER) - Apprenticeship ActDelegate McCrayEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 782Economic Matters
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Capital Budget (B5)
SB0171
    (HB0151 / CH0022)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2017, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2009, 2012, 2013, 2014, 2015, and 2016PresidentIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationCapital Budget (B5)
SB0699
    (HB0467 / CH0782)
Providing Our Workers Education and Readiness (POWER) - Apprenticeship ActSenator RosapepeIn the House - Second Reading PassedFinance
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Economic MattersCapital Budget (B5)
SB0782 / CH0087
    (HB0074 / CH0021)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014 - Baltimore County - Chesapeake High StadiumSenator SallingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 87Budget and Taxation
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB1198 / CH0019Prince George's County Regional Medical Center Act of 2017Prince George's County SenatorsEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 19Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:16 P.M.